Snider, John Milton (CPSO#: 70017)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 674-4677
Fax: (705) 674-8756
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Snider Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Snider ( CPSO# 70017 )

Business Address:
310 - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 674-4677

Business Address:
11 Meredith Street
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 368-2300

Business Address:
2120 A Highway 551
Box 170
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 377-5311

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
410 - 65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone Number: (705) 674-4677

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MILTON SNIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2001