Sohmer, Benjamin (CPSO#: 75115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa - Heart Inst.
Department of Anesthesia
Room H2410
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7381
Fax: (613) 696-7378
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Capital Periodontics
202-10 Green Street
Nepean ON  K2J 3Z6
Canada
Phone: (613) 843-0002
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benjamin Sohmer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sohmer ( CPSO# 75115 )
Dr. A. Stein ( CPSO# 75489 )

Business Address:
Capital Periodontics
202 - 10 Green Street
Ottawa ON  K2J 3Z6
Phone Number: (613) 843-0002

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Department of Anaesthesia
H2410 - 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4379

Business Address:
2nd Floor
760 Eagleson Road
Ottawa ON  K2M 0A7
Phone Number: (613) 592-9081

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN SOHMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOHMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2006