Solano Salazar, Tanya Gisela (CPSO#: 91866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Aug 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Costa Rica, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics 3AHSC
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75155
Fax: (905) 524-5707
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tanya Solano Salazar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Solano Salazar ( CPSO# 91866 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
3A HSC
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L3N 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 02 Aug 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 17 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Tanya Gisela Solano Salazar may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, Division of Emergency Medicine, McMaster University,
                        in which Dr. Solano Salazar holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Solano Salazar  no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Solano Salazar's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Solano Salazar's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on August 2, 2013, and expires on June 30,
                  2019.  Upon renewal of Dr. Solano Salazar's academic appointment at
                  McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.