Soliman, Daniel (CPSO#: 100530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Critical Care
Box 207, W2280-501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 78701
Fax: 613-739-6695
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: 613-345-5645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: 613-969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017