Soliman, Sherrin (CPSO#: 91709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Manitou Dental Centre
Suite 5
5 Manitou Drive
Kitchener ON  N2C 2J6
Phone: 5198968008
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

750 Ottawa St S.
Kitchener ON  N2E 1B6
Canada
Phone: (519) 570-3174
Fax: (519) 570-4825
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Soliman Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Soliman ( CPSO# 91709 )

Business Address:
750 Ottawa Street South
Kitchener ON  N2E 1B6
Phone Number: (519) 570-3174

Business Address:
Manitou Dental Centre
Suite 5
5 Manitou Drive
Kitchener ON  N2C 2J6
Phone Number: (519) 896-8008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERRIN SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011