Somani, Sohel (CPSO#: 72340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone: (905) 456-9500
Fax: (905) 456-9508
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 110
2101 Brimley Road
Scarborough ON  M1S 2B4
Canada
Phone: 4142920330
Fax: 4162929331
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 221
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 761-7002
Fax: (905) 761-7003
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sohel Somani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Somani ( CPSO# 72340 )

Business Address:
2101 Brimley Road
Suite 109
Toronto ON  M1S 2B4
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
Suite 221
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (905) 761-7002

Business Address:
Suite 401
7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone Number: (905) 456-9500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOHEL SOMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003