Sommerfreund, Rafi David (CPSO#: 90205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 685-8225
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. David Sommerfreund Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sommerfreund ( CPSO# 90205 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2
Phone Number: (519) 873-1700

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAFI DAVID SOMMERFREUND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMMERFREUND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2009 to 26 Apr 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Apr 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Sep 2009 to 21 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Sep 2010 to 21 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Oct 2012 to 09 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2014