Sondhi, Jitin (CPSO#: 87312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sakura House Hospice
715180 Oxford Rd#4
RR#5
Woodstock ON  N4S 7V9
Phone: 519 537 8515 Ext. 5
Fax: 519 421 1057
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon St
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: 519 485 1700
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A1
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jitin Sondhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sondhi ( CPSO# 87312 )

Business Address:
Sakura House Hospice
715180 Oxford Rd #4
Woodbridge ON  N4S 7V9
Phone Number: (519) 537-8515

Business Address:
Alexandra Medical Centre
29 Noxon Street
2nd Floor
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-9617

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A1
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JITIN SONDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONDHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2010

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 5, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)