Soneji, Prachi (CPSO#: 84293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Parikh, Prachi (used until: 27 Oct 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Patient Networks
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone: (416) 362-8822
Fax: (416) 362-8877
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Soneji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Soneji ( CPSO# 84293 )
Dr. N. Soneji ( CPSO# 86685 )

Business Address:
Patient Networks
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 362-8822

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
MCL 2-405
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRACHI SONEJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONEJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008