Song, Christine Hahjin (CPSO#: 88576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
4 Cardinal Carter North
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3056
Fax: (416) 864-6046
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Hutchinson-Jaffe & Song Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hutchinson-Jaffe ( CPSO# 88345 )
Dr. C. Song ( CPSO# 88576 )

Business Address:
108A - 5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (647) 350-3332

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
4 Cardinal Carter
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3056

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 28 Feb 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE HAHJIN SONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012