Soodan, Baldev Singh (CPSO#: 30659)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Jammu University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baldev Soodan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2018