Sowerby, Robert J (CPSO#: 93675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vaughan Urology Associates
2630 Rutherford Road, Suite 201
Vaughan ON  L4K0H2
Phone: 905-832-8428
Fax: 905-832-6651
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Sowerby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sowerby ( CPSO# 93675 )

Business Address:
201 - 2630 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Phone Number: (905) 832-8428

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT J SOWERBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOWERBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015