Spacek, Alena Marie (CPSO#: 76249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Emergency Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alena Spacek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Spacek ( CPSO# 76249 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Emergency Department
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALENA MARIE SPACEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPACEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2004