Spadafora, Silvana (CPSO#: 59935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 4450
Fax: (705) 759-3815
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Algoma District Cancer Program
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 4450
Fax: (705) 759-3815
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Silvana Spadafora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Spadafora ( CPSO# 59935 )

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 5V2
Phone Number: (705) 253-2848

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SILVANA SPADAFORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPADAFORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 23 Nov 1993
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1993