Spevick, Jeremy Samuel (CPSO#: 87921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:George Washington University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 315
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone: 647-344-7500
Fax: 647-344-7600
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7725 Birchmount Ave
Unit 5
Markham ON  L3R 9X3
Canada
Phone: 905-475-9700
Fax: 905-475-5913
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeremy Spevick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Spevick ( CPSO# 87921 )

Business Address:
Suite 315
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone Number: (647) 344-7500

Business Address:
Suite 5
7725 Birchmount Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9X3
Phone Number: (905) 475-9700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY SAMUEL SPEVICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPEVICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013