Spicer, Tara Lee (CPSO#: 91094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court St N
Thunder Bay ON
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 2X8
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Fax: (807) 346-6206
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. TL Spicer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Spicer ( CPSO# 91094 )

Business Address:
Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 2X8
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA LEE SPICER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPICER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011