Spitale, Naomi Silvia (CPSO#: 82986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 303
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 722-9900
Fax: (613) 722-9100
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Canada
Phone: (613)722-6521 Ext. 6226
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613)432-8259
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naomi Spitale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Spitale ( CPSO# 82986 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 722-9900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 04 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAOMI SILVIA SPITALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPITALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010