Spring, Shanna (CPSO#: 90875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4298
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite N203
801 King Edward Ave
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Canada
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shanna Spring Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Spring ( CPSO# 90875 )

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
Suite N203
801 King Edward
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNA SPRING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015