Sridhar, Srikala Sujata (CPSO#: 72209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Suite 700U 7-625
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 2662
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Srikala Sridhar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sridhar ( CPSO# 72209 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Suite 700U 7-625
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 12 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SRIKALA SUJATA SRIDHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRIDHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 12 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2002