Srinivasan, Ilavajady (CPSO#: 85238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: Ilavajady, Srinivasan (used until: 25 Oct 2007 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Thanjavur Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilavajady Srinivasan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Srinivasan ( CPSO# 85238 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILAVAJADY SRINIVASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRINIVASAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Aug 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 28 Mar 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2009