St. Amour, Nicole Danielle (CPSO#: 76288)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8Y 1R8
Phone: (519) 945-1171
Fax: (519) 945-1173
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. ND St. Amour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. St. Amour ( CPSO# 76288 )

Business Address:
2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8Y 1R8
Phone Number: (519) 945-1171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE DANIELLE ST. AMOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST. AMOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2003