Steele, Stephen Scott (CPSO#: 73771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Urology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-6090
Fax: (613) 545-1970
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: 613-544-3310
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Lennox and Addington County General
Hospital
8 Richmond Park Dr
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: 613-354-3301 Ext. 202
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
Box 64
19 Hospital Dr
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Canada
Phone: 705-658-4544
Fax: 705-658-4917
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.S. Steele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Steele ( CPSO# 73771 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Lennox & Addington County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
19 Hospital Drive
Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 11 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN SCOTT STEELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEELE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2005