Stein, Nina Rodrigues (CPSO#: 91493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Rio Grande Sul, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS McMaster Univ Medical Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76807
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nina Stein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Stein ( CPSO# 91493 )
Dr. M. Seed ( CPSO# 85250 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Portugal

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 06 Jul 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Radiology Effective: 06 Jul 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 03 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Nina Rodrigues Stein may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.