Steiner, Meir (CPSO#: 42447)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Meir Steiner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Steiner ( CPSO# 42447 )

Business Address:
Women's Mental Health Clinic
720 Guelph Line
Suite 301
Burlington ON  L7R 4E2
Phone Number: (905) 631-9650

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2018