Stewart, James William (CPSO#: 76430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Melita Cr
Toronto ON  M6G 3G4
Phone: 416-530-1330
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto South Detention Centre
160 Horner St
Toronto ON  M8Z 0C2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr. E.
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Peel Memorial UCC
20 Lynch St
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

North Bay Regional Health Center
Emergency Dept
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 4500
Fax: (705) 495-7975
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James W. Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 76430 )

Business Address:
Christie Gardens
600 Melita Court
Toronto ON  M6G 3G4
Phone Number: (416) 530-1330

Business Address:
160 Horner Avenue
Toronto ON  M8Z 0C2
Phone Number: (416) 354-4030

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Boulevard East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 495-2120

Business Address:
50 College Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES WILLIAM STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003