Stewart, Philippe Jonathan (CPSO#: 96445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay St
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philippe Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Stewart ( CPSO# 96445 )

Business Address:
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIPPE JONATHAN STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013