Stiell, Andrew Pettigrew (CPSO#: 91984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Stiell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Stiell ( CPSO# 91984 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 14 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW PETTIGREW STIELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STIELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011