Storr, Michael (CPSO#: 57110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth Medical Clinic
14 Isabella Street
Perth ON  K7H 2W6
Phone: (613) 267-1200
Fax: (613) 264-8470
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Storr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Storr ( CPSO# 57110 )

Business Address:
14 Isabella Street
Perth ON  K7H 2W6
Phone Number: (613) 267-1200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL STORR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STORR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1987