Strickland, Louis-Matthieu (CPSO#: 93283)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Madeleine Woods Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Strickland ( CPSO# 93283 )
Dr. M. Woods ( CPSO# 101275)

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018