Suffoletta, Paula Maria (CPSO#: 95292)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Medical Clinic
74 Front St E
Strathroy ON  N7G 1Y7
Phone: (519) 245-0430
Fax: 519-245-5870
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suffoletta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Suffoletta ( CPSO# 95292 )

Business Address:
Strathroy Medical Clinic
74 Front Street East
Strathroy ON  N7G 1Y7
Phone Number: (519) 245-0430

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULA MARIA SUFFOLETTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUFFOLETTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013