Surry, Susan Alicia Mackworth (CPSO#: 71545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Couchiching Family Health Team
School Success Program
119 Memorial Avenue
Suite 200
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 329-3649 Ext. 290
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. A. DePiero Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. DePiero ( CPSO# 71239 )
Dr. S. Surry ( CPSO# 71545 )

Business Address:
2 Albert Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4J1
Phone Number: (705) 878-0933

Business Address:
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3C 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
18 Wyandotte Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5M6
Phone Number: (705) 326-5774

Business Address:
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 329-3649

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ALICIA MACKWORTH SURRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001