Szabo, Elod Zala (CPSO#: 85097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Szeged, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elod Z. Szabo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Szabo ( CPSO# 85097 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELOD ZALA SZABO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZABO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009