Tadros, Manal Adly Halim (CPSO#: 89160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-6060 Ext. 2150
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alpha Labs Inc.
1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3B 2W7
Canada
Phone: 4164492166
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manal Tadros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tadros ( CPSO# 89160 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANAL ADLY HALIM TADROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TADROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2015