Taha, Nashwah Mohamed Yassin (CPSO#: 90877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Avenue East
Unit 405
Scarborough, ON
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 335-3733
Fax: 416 840 6885
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3030 Birchmount Road
The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
Scarborough ON  M1W 1W3
Canada
Phone: 416 495 2400 Ext. 5339
Fax: 416 495 2579
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nashwah Taha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Taha ( CPSO# 90877 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
405 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 335-3733

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASHWAH MOHAMED YASSIN TAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2013