Tahir, Ferhana (CPSO#: 84959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ritson North Medical centre
Unit #9
1288 Ritson road north
Oshawa ON  L1G 7Z9
Phone: 905-240-7662
Fax: 289-731-2064
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ferhana Tahir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tahir ( CPSO# 84959 )

Business Address:
Family Care Medical Centre
Whitby Towne Square
104 - 3050 Garden Street
Whitby ON  L1R 2G7
Phone Number: (905) 430-5305

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FERHANA TAHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 13 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2007 to 13 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2008