Takhar, Baldeep (CPSO#: 82048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Oct 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Manchester, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1150 Franklin Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J2
Phone: (519) 620-7044
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Takhar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Takhar ( CPSO# 82048 )

Business Address:
1150 Franklin Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J2
Phone Number: (519) 620-7044


Corporation Name: Dr. Takhar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. B. Takhar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Takhar ( CPSO# 82048 )

Business Address:
1150 Franklin Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J2
Phone Number: (519) 620-7044

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 18 Jun 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: (September 21, 2017) Allegations of Dr. Takhar’s professional misconduct and incompetence were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Takhar is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in her care of and administration of the care of patients. It is also alleged that Dr. Takhar engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in her administrative conduct and practice management at a family health organization.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Hearing dates: April 1-5, April 22-26, May 6-10, May 21-24, 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 18, 2018, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certficate of registration held by Dr. Baldeep Takhar, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Takhar has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                          DR. BALDEEP TAKHAR
                                            ("Dr. Takhar")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the
                  Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Takhar, certificate of registration number 82048, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, in the matters of College File Numbers 95247,
                  96010, 96184, and 7214380, (i) allegations that I engaged in professional
                  misconduct in that I failed to maintain the standard of practice of the
                  profession and engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of
                  medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably
                  be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional,
                  and (i) allegations that I am incompetent. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Takhar, have read the Notice of Hearing dated September 21, 2017,
                  which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that the ICR Committee has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time. I further acknowledge that this Undertaking replaces a prior
                  Undertaking into which I entered on October 24, 2017, which had
                  previously been accepted by the ICR Committee in lieu of making an Order
                  under section 25.4 of the Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the
                  ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (7)   I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (8)   I, Dr. Takhar, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately. 

            (9)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Takhar, undertake to practice at a single practice location
                        only (my "Practice    Location").  For greater certainty, I may
                        practice at no more than one hospital, clinic, or office. 
                  
            (10)  Clinical Supervision 

                  (b)   I, Dr. Takhar, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)") ("Clinical Supervision"), and understand that the
                        purpose of the Clinical Supervision is to protect patients while
                        this Undertaking is in force.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting, which shall be selected by the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) independent of my participation, on the basis
                              of the concerns regarding clinical care and/or risk to
                              patients identified in the medical inspector's report(s),
                              dated December 1, 2015, December 5, 2015, December 6, 2015,
                              December 23, 2015 (x2), January 25, 2016, March 20, 2016,
                              March 28, 2016, April 23, 2016 (x2), May 30, 2016, June 15,
                              2016, October 30, 2016 (the "Medical Inspectors' Reports"),
                              and any concerns regarding clinical care and/or risk to
                              patients that arise during the period of Clinical
                              Supervision;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (v)   Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of
                        concern identified in the Medical Inspectors' Reports, and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Takhar, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements or administrative
                        changes and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Takhar, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within seven
                        (7) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Takhar, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (10)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (10)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Takhar, undertake to inform the College of my Practice Location
                  within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, if I
                  cease to practice at my Practice Location and will begin to practice at a
                  new Practice Location, I undertake to inform the College of the new
                  Practice Location within five (5) days of commencing practice there.

            (12)  I, Dr. Takhar, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Location and and to any other
                  activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance
                  with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (16)  I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (17)  I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,
                  at my Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (18)  I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any Order
                  of the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (19)  I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (20)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (20)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Dr. Takhar is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee
                        into allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence. As
                        a result of the referral:
                  
                        Dr. Takhar can practice at only a single practice location, of
                        which she must advise the College.
                        Dr. Takhar must practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (21)  I, Dr. Takhar, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, the Drug Program Services Branch, NMS
                  and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information,
                  in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of
                  this Undertaking. 

            (22)  I, Dr. Takhar, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C", respectively. 

            (23)  I, Dr. Takhar, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (24)  I, Dr. Takhar, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (25)  I, Dr. Takhar, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors
                  and Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                  Undertaking. 
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Baldeep Takhar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 18, 2018:

Dr. Takhar is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Takhar can practice at only a single practice location, of which she must advise the College.

Dr. Takhar must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.