Tang, Joyce (CPSO#: 91145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 502-8100
Fax: (416) 502-8110
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bosco T. M. Lui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lui ( CPSO# 82416 )
Dr. J. Tang ( CPSO# 91145 )

Business Address:
5 & 6 - 8355 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 2P4
Phone Number: (289) 800-7128

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOYCE TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016