Tanguay, Jeffrey Joseph (CPSO#: 79015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-548-6035
Fax: 613-548-1364
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 314-4040
Fax: (416) 314-4060
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Dynacare Next
1100 Bennett Road
Bowmanville ON  L1C 3K5
Canada
Phone: 18884974711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grin Tanguay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grin ( CPSO# 82924 )
Dr. J. Tanguay ( CPSO# 79015 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY JOSEPH TANGUAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANGUAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2009