Tauqir, Syeda Naghmana (CPSO#: 83111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock Hospital
Dept Of Anatomic Pathology
310 Julianna Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211 Ext. 3404
Fax: (519) 421-4237
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.N.Tauqir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tauqir ( CPSO# 83111 )

Business Address:
Suite 505
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYEDA NAGHMANA TAUQIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAUQIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2010