Tauseef, Nazia (CPSO#: 83288)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: (905) 721-4992
Fax: (905) 721-6194
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nazia Tauseef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tauseef ( CPSO# 83288 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone Number: (905) 721-4991

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAZIA TAUSEEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAUSEEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009