Taylor, Michelle Tania Gaby (CPSO#: 72589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Nov 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Horonczyk, Michelle Tania Gaby (used until: 22 May 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice address is not available
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Phone: 905-475-3121
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Taylor ( CPSO# 72589 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2005
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 31 May 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Feb 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Feb 2008 Active View Details [+]
            Effective November 30, 2005, the Discipline Committee directed the Registrar to
            impose terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration
            held by Dr. Michelle T.G. Taylor, of which the following remains in effect:

                  --  Dr. Taylor may not prescribe methadone.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Nov 2005
Summary:

 On November 30, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Horonczyk to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct in that she engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable of unprofessional.

1.	The Registrar suspend Dr. Horonczyk's 
 certificate of registration for a period of nine (9) 	months, effective December 1, 2005, three 
 (3) months of which shall be suspended upon 	Dr. Horonczyk's successful completion of the 
 College's Boundaries Course and the 	College's Ethics Course, at her own expense.

2.	The 
 Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Horonczyk's 	certificate 
 of registration:

(i)	Dr. Horonczyk will have a practice monitor for a period of eighteen (18) 
 months.  		The practice monitor must be another member of the College, approved by the 		College, 
 and must meet with Dr. Horonczyk not less than once a month to review 		her records and discuss 
 her care of patients and her professional behaviour, and 		must report to the College every three 
 months, or sooner should he/she have any 		concerns about her professional behaviour or the care 
 she is providing to patients;

(ii)	Dr. Horonczyk may not prescribe methadone; and

(iii)	Prior to 
 Dr. Horonczyk's return to practice, her treating psychiatrist shall provide a 		report to the 
 College confirming Dr. Horonczyk's readiness to return to practice.

3.	The Discipline Committee 
 further directs the results of the proceeding to be included in 	the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 30, 2005