Taylor, Valerie Hannah (CPSO#: 73630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
9th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 4381
Fax: (416) 323-7718
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valerie Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Taylor ( CPSO# 73630 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
9th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 627-9641

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE HANNAH TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004