Thakur, Varsha (CPSO#: 79113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Pediatric Medicine Clinic
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4120
Fax: (905) 813-4128
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiology
The Labatt Family Health Centre
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 582-9648
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jayaraman & Thakur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jayaraman ( CPSO# 77546 )
Dr. V. Thakur ( CPSO# 79113 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Centre
Suite 240
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6653

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiology
The Labatt Family Health Centre
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7467

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VARSHA THAKUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAKUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 12 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012