Thannikkotu, Benny Paul (CPSO#: 83794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
178-201 John street
Brampton ON  L6W 2A4
Phone: (905) 451-0007
Fax: (905) 451-0003
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

201 - 178 John Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2A4
Canada
Phone: (905) 451-0007
Fax: (905) 451-0003
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benny Thannikkotu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Thannikkotu ( CPSO# 83794 )

Business Address:
201-178 John Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2A4
Phone Number: (905) 451-0007

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Iowa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 4, 2011
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On May 24, 2011, Trillium Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Benny Paul Thannikkotu privileges were suspended, effective May 4, 2011.

On January 12, 2012, Trillium Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Benny P. Thannikkotu's privileges were reinstated for the year 2010/2011, effective September 16, 2011.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 24 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 23 May 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 23, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Benny Paul Thannikkotu
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Thannikkotu has given to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                      DR. BENNY PAUL THANNIKKOTU
                                          ("Dr. Thannikkotu")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, certificate of registration number 83794, am a member
                  of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that the College initiated an
                  investigation bearing File Number 7215167 (the "Investigation") into
                  whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my
                  vascular imaging practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of six (6) months on the terms set
                        out below ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of
                        Clinical Supervision set out below will only be reduced upon
                        recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval by the
                        College.
                  
            Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")

                  (c)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to engage in Phase 1 of Clinical
                        Supervision for a minimum of two (2) months on the terms set out
                        below.
                  
                  (d)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to meet with my
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) at least once every two (2) weeks, for a
                        minimum of four (4) meetings, to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of 20 charts for patients who have had
                        vascular testing.
                  
                  (e)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to facilitate my
                        Clinical Supervisor's observation of three (3) patient
                        consultations on three (3) dates, for a minimum observation of nine
                        (9) patient consultations.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every month.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that upon completion of the
                        elements set out above and after a minimum of two (2) months of
                        Phase 1, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in a less
                        highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that supervision be reduced.
                  
            Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")

                  (h)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to engage in Phase 2
                        of Clinical Supervision for a minimum of four (4) months on the
                        terms set out below.
                  
                  (i)   During Phase 2, I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to meet with my
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) at least once every month, for a minimum of
                        four (4) meetings, to discuss the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review
                        of 20 charts for patients who have had vascular testing.
                  
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every month.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that after a minimum of four (4)
                        months of Phase 2, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that
                        I have the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice
                        without supervision, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may recommend to
                        the College that the Clinical Supervision cease.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical
                        Supervision will only cease upon recommendation of the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
                  (m)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at a minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (n)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        location approved by the College;
                  
                  (o)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report(s) of the
                        medical inspector dated August 16, 2016 and November 2, 2016, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (p)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (q)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (r)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (s)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(q)
                        and/or (r) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (t)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (5)(s) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   A program of my choice that is a minimum of six hours in
                              length with a focus on the indications for and technique of
                              non-invasive vascular testing;
                  
                        (ii)  One-on-one instruction in professionalism with an instructor
                              acceptable to the College;
                  
                        (iii) University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Medical
                              Record Keeping: http://www.cpd.utoronto.ca/recordkeeping/;
                  
                        (iv)  Review of the CPSO Policy "Medical Records":
                              http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Medical-Records;
                  
                        (v)   Review and written summary of the following:
                  
                              1.    Recommendation of the Society for Vascular Surgery
                                    regarding routine ultrasound surveillance of carotid
                                    arteries:
                                    http://www.choosingwisely.org/clinician-lists/society-vascular-surgery-ultrasound-for-routine-surveillance-of-carotid-arteries/;
                                    and
                  
                              2.    The College of Family Physicians of Canada "Guide to
                                    Enhancing Referrals and Consultations Between
                                    Physicians":
                                    http://www.cfpc.ca/ProjectAssets/Templates/Resource.aspx?id=3448.
                  
                        (vi)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to complete the Professional
                        Education within six (6) months from the date upon which I sign
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (5) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake to inform the College of each and
                        every location that I practise or have privileges, including, but
                        not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP
                        consent form attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thannikkotu, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Thannikkotu engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in his vascular imaging practice. As a result of
                              the investigation:
                  
                                    *     Dr. Thannikkotu will practise under the guidance
                                          of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the
                                          College for a minimum of 6 months. 
                                    *     Dr. Thannikkotu will engage in professional
                                          education in the indications for and technique of
                                          non-invasive vascular testing; professionalism;
                                          and medical record-keeping.
                                    *     Dr. Thannikkotu's practice will be reassessed by
                                          an assessor selected by the College approximately
                                          6 months following the the end of the period of
                                          Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Thannikkotu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Thannikkotu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Thannikkotu, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:




                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Benny Paul Thannikkotu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 23, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Thannikkotu engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his vascular imaging practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Thannikkotu will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 6 months.
• Dr. Thannikkotu will engage in professional education in the indications for and technique of non-invasive vascular testing; professionalism; and medical record-keeping.
• Dr. Thannikkotu’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months following the the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.