Tharmaratnam, Thadsha (CPSO#: 84557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: 905-873-0111
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Tharmaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tharmaratnam ( CPSO# 84557 )

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THADSHA THARMARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THARMARATNAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008