Tharmaratnam, Umamaheswary (CPSO#: 73051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Colombo, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: (416) 586-8664
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Umamaheswary Tharmaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Tharmaratnam ( CPSO# 73051 )

Business Address:
123 Edward Street
Suite 400
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 597-0997

Business Address:
710 Dorval Drive
Suite 202
Oakville ON  L6J 3V7
Phone Number: (905) 338-0151

Business Address:
Provis Endoscopy
Units 7-10
3095 Glen Erin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1J3
Phone Number: (950) 607-0022

Business Address:
Advanced Endoscopy
2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-7007

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Room 19-104
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UMAMAHESWARY THARMARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THARMARATNAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 1998 to 14 Sep 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999