Thayaparen, Yasotha (CPSO#: 93387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:UNIVERSITY OF SRI JAYEWARDENEPURA, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Ajax Medical Clinic
475 Westney Road North
Ajax ON  L1T 3H4
Phone: (905) 427-7767
Fax: (905) 427-4339
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Thayaparen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Thayaparen ( CPSO# 93387 )

Business Address:
North Ajax Medical Clinic
475 Westney Road North
Ajax ON  L1T 3H4
Phone Number: (905) 427-7767

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASOTHA THAYAPAREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAYAPAREN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2012