Theriault, Josee (CPSO#: 77192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Josee Theriault Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Theriault ( CPSO# 77192 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Oct 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEE THERIAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THERIAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2002 to 28 Jul 2002
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2001