Thiryayi, Wasiq Ahmad (CPSO#: 108876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cheetham Hill Medical Centre
244 Cheetham Hill Road
Manchester M8 8UP
United Kingdom
Phone: 07958715753
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wasiq Ahmad Thiryayi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Thiryayi ( CPSO# 108876)

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WASIQ AHMAD THIRYAYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIRYAYI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 May 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2017