Thiviyarajah, Sangeetha (CPSO#: 89762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 494-6481
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 103
56 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9V 3Z7
Canada
Phone: 416-748-5656
Fax: 416-748-9829
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sangeetha Thiviyarajah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thiviyarajah ( CPSO# 89762 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Department of Internal Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANGEETHA THIVIYARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIVIYARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2013